US HB6368 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To assist Tribal governments in the management of buffalo and buffalo habitat and the reestablishment of buffalo on Indian land.
Title
Indian Buffalo Management Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs Discharged |
2023-12-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs. |
2023-11-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5933) |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2908 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6368/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6368/BILLS-118hr6368ih.pdf |