US HB6228 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the increase in the estate and gift tax exemption made by Public Law 115-97. This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the $10 million exemption amount for the estate and gift tax. (Under current law, the exemption amount has been temporarily increased from $5 million to $10 million for decedents dying or gifts made after December 31, 2017, and before January 1, 2026. The amount is indexed for inflation after 2011.)
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the increase in the estate and gift tax exemption made by Public Law 115-97.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6760 (Related) 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1084 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6228/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6228/BILLS-115hr6228ih.pdf |