US HB6186 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Follow the Rules Act (Sec. 2) This bill extends the prohibition against a person taking, failing to take, or threatening to take or fail to take a personnel action against any employee or applicant for employment for refusing to obey an order that would require the individual to violate a law to personnel actions against such an individual for refusing to obey an order that would violate a rule or regulation.
Title
Follow the Rules Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7012) |
2016-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6186. |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7012-7014) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 660. |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-842. |
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |