US HB6040 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 649.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 649.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contra Costa Canal Transfer Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior, in consideration for the Contra Costa Water District, California, assuming all liability for the Contra Costa Canal, to offer to convey to the district all U.S. interest in the canal and associated land. Interior shall convey to the district all U.S. interest in the Rock Slough fish screen facility pursuant to an agreement that ensures the continued safe and reliable operations of the facility. (Sec. 4) The United States shall not be liable for damages arising out of any act, omission, or occurrence relating to the canal or the acquired land, with an exception for acts of negligence. (Sec. 5) Interior shall report to Congress on the status of, any obstacles to completing, and an anticipated date of completion of, the conveyance and assignment.
Title
Contra Costa Canal Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 649. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-362. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8160-8161) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6040. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8160-8162) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-31 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 707. |
2018-08-31 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-911. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2018-07-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3001 (Same As) 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
Subjects
California
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply