US SB3001 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contra Costa Canal Transfer Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior, in consideration for the Contra Costa Water District, California, assuming all liability for the Contra Costa Canal, to offer to convey to the district all U.S. interest in the canal and associated land. Upon agreement between Interior and the district regarding safe and reliable operations of the Rock Slough fish screen facility, Interior shall convey to the district all U.S. interest in the facility.
Title
Contra Costa Canal Transfer Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-359. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3036-3037) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6040 (Same As) 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 649.
Subjects
California
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply