US HB6009 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Agency Mail Management Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Presidential and Federal Records Act Amendments of 2014 to require the General Services Administration (GSA) to provide guidance and assistance to federal agencies for effective mail processing. The GSA: (1) must promote economy and efficiency in the selection and utilization of space, staff, equipment, and supplies for federal mail processing facilities; and (2) may inspect the mail processing practices and programs of federal agencies for purposes of recommending improvements. The bill also provides authority for the GSA to set goals for the establishment and maintenance of federal records management systems or techniques.
Title
Federal Agency Mail Management Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7011-7012) |
2016-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6009. |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7011-7012) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 647. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-825. |
2016-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-09-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |