US HB5875 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SAVE Act of 2014
Title
SAVE Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2171 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4376 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1145 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1970 (Related) 2014-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4376 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1145 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1970 (Related) 2014-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Financial literacy
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Insurance industry and regulation
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Financial literacy
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Insurance industry and regulation
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5875/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5875/BILLS-113hr5875ih.pdf |