US SB1970 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement Security Act of 2014 - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) prescribe final regulations to permit employers to participate in multiple employer pension benefit plans, (2) promulgate regulations or other guidance to simplify and clarify rules relating to the timing of participant notices required under tax-preferred pension plans and the automatic escalation rules, and (3) modify the 1040EZ tax return form to allow taxpayers to claim the tax credit for retirement savings (saver's credit) on such form. Amends the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) and the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to employer pension benefit plans, to: (1) allow employers to maintain a tax-exempt multiple employer pension benefit plan even if the employers sponsoring the plan share no common interest, (2) modify requirements for secure deferral arrangements with respect to nondiscrimination and employer matching contributions, and (3) allow employers with not more than 100 employees a business-related tax credit to cover increased matching contributions required by this Act.
Title
Retirement Security Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S600-601) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4376 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2171 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5875 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB1145 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2171 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5875 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB1145 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of the Treasury
Employee benefits and pensions
Financial services and investments
Income tax credits
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Department of the Treasury
Employee benefits and pensions
Financial services and investments
Income tax credits
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1970/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1970/BILLS-113s1970is.pdf |