US HB5766 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Securing Public Areas of Transportation Facilities Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a working group to promote collaborative engagement between DHS and public and private sector stakeholders to develop non-binding recommendations for enhancing security in public areas of transportation facilities (including facilities that are surface transportation assets). (Sec. 4) DHS shall: (1) inform owners and operators of surface transportation assets about the availability of technical assistance to help protect and enhance the resilience of public areas of such assets, (2) provide such assistance to requesting owners and operators of surface transportation assets, and (3) publish best practices for protecting and enhancing the resilience of public areas of transportation facilities. (Sec. 5) The Transportation Security Administration (TSA) shall submit to specified congressional committees a review of regulations, directives, policies, and procedures issued by the TSA regarding the transportation of a firearm and ammunition.
Title
Securing Public Areas of Transportation Facilities Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5629-5630) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5766. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5629-5630) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 604. |
2018-06-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-778. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4474 (Related) 2017-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Motor carriers
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Roads and highways
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Motor carriers
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Roads and highways
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security