US HB4474 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Surface Transportation and Public Area Security Act of 2017
Title
Surface Transportation and Public Area Security Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security. |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5131 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5089 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5766 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5089 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5766 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Chemical and biological weapons
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Nuclear weapons
Performance measurement
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Right of privacy
Roads and highways
Small business
Technology assessment
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Chemical and biological weapons
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Nuclear weapons
Performance measurement
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Right of privacy
Roads and highways
Small business
Technology assessment
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4474/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4474/BILLS-115hr4474ih.pdf |