US HB5711 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No U.S. Financing for Iran Act TITLE I--IRAN FINANCING PROHIBITION (Sec. 101) This bill prohibits the Department of the Treasury from authorizing U.S. financial institution transactions in connection with the export or re-export of commercial passenger aircraft to the Islamic Republic of Iran. (Sec. 102) Any transaction authorized by Treasury before enactment of this bill is revoked. TITLE II--NO EX-IM ASSISTANCE FOR TERRORISM No Ex-Im Assistance for Terrorism Act (Sec. 202) This bill amends the Export-Import Bank Act of 1945 to prohibit the Export-Import Bank from guaranteeing, insuring, extending credit, or participating in the extension of credit in connection with the export of U.S. goods or services sought by: the Government of Iran, an entity owned or controlled by it, an entity created under Iranian law, or a foreign subsidiary of such an entity; an entity involving the Government of Iran, owned or controlled by the Government of Iran, created under Iranian law, or a foreign subsidiary of such an entity; or a non-U.S. entity that, in the last five-years, has leased or sold aircraft to the Government of Iran, or a subsidiary or controlling parent of such a non-U.S. entity. The Bank must cancel approved financing if it finds that such financing has facilitated the export, sale, or lease of an aircraft to the Government of Iran or a related entity and must seek immediate recovery of any amount it has provided in connection with the transaction. TITLE III--SUNSET (Sec. 301) This bill shall cease to be effective 30 days after the President certifies to Congress that the Government of Iran has ceased support for acts of international terrorism.
Title
No U.S. Financing for Iran Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-17 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 181 N: 235 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-11-17 - House - On Passage (Y: 243 N: 174 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-17 - House - On Passage (Y: 243 N: 174 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-17 - House - On Passage (Y: 243 N: 174 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-17 - House - On Passage (Y: 243 N: 174 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2016-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-17 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 174 (Roll no. 587). |
2016-11-17 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 181 - 235 (Roll no. 586). (consideration: CR H6288-6289) |
2016-11-17 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Roll Call 586 - Yea and Nay vote pending. |
2016-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6288-6289) |
2016-11-17 | House | The Chair announced that the unfinished business and pursuant to a previous order of the House, the question was on adoption of a motion to recommit with instructions, which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2016-11-16 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on adopting the motion and by voice vote, announced that the nays had prevailed. Mr. Swalwell (CA) demanded the yeas and nays, and pursuant to a previous order of the House, the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced. |
2016-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a section to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing a transaction described under section 101 by a U.S. financial institution if such institution is engaged in business with a foreign entity that has been found to have engaged in or authorized cyber attacks targeting any election held in the United States. |
2016-11-16 | House | Mr. Swalwell (CA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (consideration: CR H6264; text: CR H6264) |
2016-11-16 | House | H.Amdt.1480 On agreeing to the Huizenga (MI) amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2016-11-16 | House | H.Amdt.1480 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6264) |
2016-11-16 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 921, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga (MI) amendment. |
2016-11-16 | House | H.Amdt.1480 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Huizenga (MI). (consideration: CR H6263-6264; text: CR H6263) |
2016-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5711. |
2016-11-16 | House | The rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5711 and H.R. 5982. |
2016-11-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 921. (consideration: CR H6255-6265; text of measure as reported in House: CR H6255-6256) |
2016-11-16 | House | ORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Huizenga (MI) asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting a motion to recommit on H.R. 5711 be subject to postponement as though under Clause 8 of Rule 20. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 921 Reported to House. The rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5711 and H.R. 5982. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 634. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-810. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 21. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2016-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-07-07 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Introduction and Referral. |