US HB5706 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes formal sexual assault and harassment policies for the transportation industry. Among other things, the bill requires certain passenger transportation carriers, including passenger airlines and vessels, buses, commuter and intercity passenger railroads, and transportation network companies (e.g., Uber or Lyft) to establish formal policies, training, and reporting structures regarding sexual assault and harassment; sets forth civil penalties for individuals who physically assault or sexually assault or threaten to assault transportation personnel; directs the Department of Transportation (DOT) to collect information on the number of sexual assault and harassment incidents reported by the carriers and make such information publicly available; expands the reporting process for individuals involved in transportation sexual assault or harassment incidents by allowing such individuals to report allegations to law enforcement in a manner that protects their privacy and confidentiality; assesses the accuracy of the reporting of transportation sexual assault or harassment incidents by the carriers; and requires DOT to develop and publish a definition of sexual harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stop Sexual Assault and Harassment in Transportation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 339 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-16SenateStar Print ordered on the bill.
2022-03-31SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2022-03-30HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-03-30HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 339 - 85 (Roll no. 90). (text: CR H3983-3987)
2022-03-30HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3995-3996)
2022-03-30HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-03-30HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5706.
2022-03-30HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3983-3988)
2022-03-30HouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2022-03-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
2022-03-24HouseCommittee on the Budget discharged.
2022-03-24HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2022-03-24HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-278, Part I.
2021-10-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-10-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-10-27HouseSubcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged.
2021-10-27HouseSubcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
2021-10-27HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
2021-10-27HouseSubcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
2021-10-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2021-10-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2021-10-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2021-10-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2021-10-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-10-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-10-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-10-25HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback