US HB5688 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the People-Centered Assistance Reform Effort Commission, to improve the social safety net and increase social mobility by increasing access to resources which address the underlying causes of poverty.
Title
People CARE Act People-Centered Assistance Reform Effort Act
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2021-10-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, the Judiciary, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5688/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5688/BILLS-117hr5688ih.pdf |