US HB5673 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to make technical corrections to the hazard mitigation revolving loan fund program, and for other purposes.
Title
Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Technical Corrections Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 402 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the bill. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 24 (Roll no. 92). (text: CR H3989) |
2022-03-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3997-3998) |
2022-03-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5673. |
2022-03-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3989-3990) |
2022-03-30 | House | Ms. Williams (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-275. |
2021-10-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 2. |
2021-10-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced in House |