US HB5571 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
10-20-30 Act of 2014 - Requires 10% of funds made available in appropriations Acts in FY2015-FY2025 for specified accounts or activities to be allocated for assistance in persistent poverty counties. Defines "persistent poverty counties" as any county with a poverty rate of at least 20%, as determined in each of the 1990 and 2000 decennial censuses and the Small Area Income and Poverty Estimates of the Bureau of the Census.
Title
10-20-30 Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2014-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Rural Development, and Credit. |
2014-09-19 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1490) |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, Science, Space, and Technology, Energy and Commerce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5571/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5571/BILLS-113hr5571ih.pdf |