US HB5561 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize a program for early detection, diagnosis, and treatment regarding deaf and hard-of-hearing newborns, infants, and young children, and for other purposes.
Title
Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 410 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 17 (Roll no. 417). (text: CR H7516) |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7537) |
2021-12-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5561. |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7515-7516) |
2021-12-08 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 149. |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-208. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-04 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2021-11-04 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4052 (Related) 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-241.