US SB4052 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-241.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize a program for early detection, diagnosis, and treatment regarding deaf and hard-of-hearing newborns, infants, and young children, and for other purposes.
Title
Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - House - Final Passage Under Suspension of the Rules Results (Y: 408 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-241. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 17 (Roll no. 505). (text: 12/05/2022 CR H8754) |
2022-12-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8771-8775) |
2022-12-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4052. |
2022-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8754-8755) |
2022-12-05 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-05 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-05 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6946; text: CR S6946) |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 442. |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5561 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.