US HB5532 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reconstruction Era National Historical Park Act
Title
Reconstruction Era National Historical Park Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8140-8141) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5532. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8140-8142) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 720. |
2018-09-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-927. |
2018-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
South Carolina
U.S. history
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
South Carolina
U.S. history