US HB5266 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to reauthorize and revise the National Estuary Program for FY2014-FY2018. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to make competitive awards to address urgent and challenging issues that threaten the economic and ecological well-being of coastal areas, including: extensive seagrass habitat losses, recurring harmful algae blooms, unusual marine mammal mortalities, invasive exotic species, jellyfish proliferation limiting community access to water during peak tourism seasons, flooding which may be related to sea level rise or wetland degradation or loss, or low dissolved oxygen conditions in estuarine waters. Requires the EPA to give priority to national estuary programs that are not part of the Geographic Programs as described in the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2014.
Title
To reauthorize the National Estuary Programs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-11-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7911-7912) |
2014-11-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5266. |
2014-11-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7911-7913) |
2014-11-12 | House | Mr. LoBiondo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 454. |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-612. |
2014-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-17 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2014-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2014-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5117 (Related) 2014-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Lakes and rivers
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Pest management
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Lakes and rivers
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Pest management
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection