US HB5210 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the admission and protection of refugees, asylum seekers, and other vulnerable individuals, to provide for the processing of refugees and asylum seekers in the Western Hemisphere, and to modify certain special immigrant visa programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Refugee Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Budget, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2146 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4873 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB1088 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2936 (Same As) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3048 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7030)
HB4873 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB1088 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2936 (Same As) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3048 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7030)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Afghanistan
Asia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Central America
Child safety and welfare
Citizenship and naturalization
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Costa Rica
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Economic development
Economic performance and conditions
El Salvador
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Guatemala
Health information and medical records
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Honduras
Housing finance and home ownership
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Lawyers and legal services
Mexico
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Organized crime
Political movements and philosophies
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Right of privacy
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Social security and elderly assistance
Syria
Terrorism
Visas and passports
Worker safety and health
Administrative remedies
Afghanistan
Asia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Central America
Child safety and welfare
Citizenship and naturalization
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Costa Rica
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Economic development
Economic performance and conditions
El Salvador
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Guatemala
Health information and medical records
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Honduras
Housing finance and home ownership
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iraq
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Lawyers and legal services
Mexico
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Organized crime
Political movements and philosophies
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Right of privacy
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Social security and elderly assistance
Syria
Terrorism
Visas and passports
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5210/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5210/BILLS-116hr5210ih.pdf |