US HB5192 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Children from Identity Theft Act This bill requires the Social Security Administration (SSA) to develop a database to facilitate the verification of consumer information upon request by a certified financial institution. Such verification shall be provided only with the consumer's consent and in connection with a credit transaction. Users of the database shall pay system costs as determined by the SSA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Children from Identity Theft Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - On Passage (Y: 420 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-04-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-04-17HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 420 - 1 (Roll no. 142). (text: CR H3377-3378)
2018-04-17HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-04-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5192.
2018-04-17HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5192. Rule provides for one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Ways and Means, and provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
2018-04-17HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 830. (consideration: CR H3377-3381)
2018-04-17HouseRule H. Res. 830 passed House.
2018-04-16HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 830 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5192. Rule provides for one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Ways and Means, and provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
2018-04-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 487.
2018-04-13HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-636.
2018-04-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 38 - 0.
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-03-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2498 (Related) 2018-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR830 (Related) 2018-04-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback