US HR905 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5515) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2019 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (S. 204) to authorize the use of unapproved medical products by patients diagnosed with a terminal illness in accordance with State law, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (S. 2155) to promote economic growth, provide tailored regulatory relief, and enhance consumer protections, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5515) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2019 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (S. 204) to authorize the use of unapproved medical products by patients diagnosed with a terminal illness in accordance with State law, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (S. 2155) to promote economic growth, provide tailored regulatory relief, and enhance consumer protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5515) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2019 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (S. 204) to authorize the use of unapproved medical products by patients diagnosed with a terminal illness in accordance with State law, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (S. 2155) to promote economic growth, provide tailored regulatory relief, and enhance consumer protections, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 210 (Y: 222 N: 184 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 211 (Y: 227 N: 180 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-22HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 227 - 180 (Roll no. 211). (text: CR H4292-4293)
2018-05-22HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 184 (Roll no. 210).
2018-05-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 905.
2018-05-22HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4292-4301)
2018-05-21HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 146.
2018-05-21HouseThe resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5515, S. 204 and S. 2155. The resolution provides for consideration of S. 2155 and S. 204 under a closed rule. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5515 under a structured rule and makes an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-70 considered as adopted.
2018-05-21HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-698, by Mr. Burgess.

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB204 (Related) 2018-05-30 - Became Public Law No: 115-176.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR908 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Conference held.
HR1019 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback