US HR908 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 5515) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2019 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from May 25, 2018, through June 4, 2018. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5515) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2019 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from May 25, 2018, through June 4, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 5515) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2019 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from May 25, 2018, through June 4, 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 217 (Y: 222 N: 189 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 218 (Y: 229 N: 183 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-23HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 229 - 183 (Roll no. 218). (text: CR H4593-4594)
2018-05-23HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 189 (Roll no. 217).
2018-05-23HouseDEBATE - The House continued debate on H. Res. 908.
2018-05-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 908.
2018-05-23HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4593-4603)
2018-05-22HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 148.
2018-05-22HouseThe resolution makes in order only those further amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. The rule provides that on any legislative day during the period from May 25, 2018 through June 4, 2018: the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved; and the Chair may at any time declare the House adjourned to meet at a date and time to be announced by the Chair in declaring the adjournment.
2018-05-22HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-702, by Mr. Byrne.

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR908 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback