US HB5094 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing Suspicious Activity Reporting Initiative Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) develop a strategy, by one year after this bill's enactment, to improve its operations and activities related to training, outreach, and information sharing for suspicious activity reporting to prevent acts of terrorism; (2) establish a working group to advise it on suspicious activity reporting; and (3) provide a briefing to the congressional homeland security committees on its operations and activities related to suspicious activity reporting.
Title
Enhancing Suspicious Activity Reporting Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5623-5624) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5094. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5623-5625) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. King (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466. |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-610. |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-07 | House | Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged. |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Right of privacy
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Right of privacy
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development