US HB505 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) ensure that each border security technology acquisition program that is determined to be a major acquisition program has an acquisition program baseline approved by the relevant acquisition decision authority; (2) document that each such program is meeting the cost, schedule, and performance thresholds specified in such baseline in compliance with relevant departmental acquisition policies and the Federal Acquisition Regulation; and (3) have a plan for each such program to meet program implementation objectives by managing contractor performance. "Major acquisition program" means a DHS acquisition program that is estimated by DHS to require an eventual total expenditure of at least $300 million over its life cycle cost. DHS must ensure that border security technology acquisition program managers adhere to relevant internal control standards identified by the Government Accountability Office. DHS shall submit a plan for testing and evaluation, as well as for the use of independent verification and validation resources, for border security technology so that new border security technologies are evaluated through a series of assessments, processes, and audits to ensure compliance with relevant departmental acquisition policies and the Federal Acquisition Regulation and the effectiveness of taxpayer dollars.
Title
Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-01-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-31 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H784) |
2017-01-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 505. |
2017-01-31 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H784-785) |
2017-01-31 | House | Ms. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 379.
HB3548 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 471.
SB1757 (Related) 2017-09-05 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
HB4760 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR954 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6415 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB3548 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 471.
SB1757 (Related) 2017-09-05 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
HB4760 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR954 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6415 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Immigration
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Immigration
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment