US HB496 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Star Print ordered on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the President, when determining whether Russia is a country of particular concern for religious freedom under certain federal laws, to consider incidents occurring in the parts of Ukraine that Russia (or any Russia-affiliated non-state group) occupies, controls, or recognizes as independent. (The United States may take certain actions, such as withdrawing development assistance, against a country of particular concern for religious freedom.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ukraine Religious Freedom Support Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 421 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-11SenateStar Print ordered on the bill.
2022-04-28SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2022-04-27HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2022-04-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-04-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 4 (Roll no. 129). (text: CR H4529)
2022-04-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4554)
2022-04-27HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-04-27HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 496.
2022-04-27HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4529-4530)
2022-04-27HouseMr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-04-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-04-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1310 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback