US HB4904 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lessening Regulatory Burdens on our Farmers Act of 2018 This bill requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to allow producers who enroll in the Agricultural Risk Coverage or Price Loss Coverage programs during the first enrollment period after the next farm bill for a fiscal year after FY2018 to file a one-time program contract to enroll in the program for the duration of the farm bill, instead of enrolling annually. If there is a change in a farming operation for which a producer on a farm has filed a one-time program contract permitted under this bill, the producer must filed an updated contract with USDA within one year of the time that the change occurs.
Title
Lessening Regulatory Burdens on our Farmers Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agriculture and food
Administrative remedies
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agriculture and food
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4904/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4904/BILLS-115hr4904ih.pdf |