US HB4900 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services, in consultation with a range of stakeholders, to issue guidance for uniform best practices for the delivery of telehealth services. The bill also establishes a grant program to expand access to telehealth services in rural areas and revises the duties of the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation to incentivize the adoption of telehealth services.
Title
Telehealth Across State Lines Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] |
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2408 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7992 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7992 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4900/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4900/BILLS-116hr4900ih.pdf |