US HB4900 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Information Security Amendments Act of 2010 - Revises provisions of federal law concerning government information security. Establishes: (1) in the Executive Office of the President the National Office for Cyberspace to serve as the principle office for coordinating an assured, reliable, secure, and survivable information infrastructure and related capabilities; and (2) within such Office the Federal Cybersecurity Practice Board, which shall be responsible for developing and periodically updating information security policies and procedures. Requires the Director of such Office to: (1) develop and oversee the implementation of policies, standards, and guidelines on information security; and (2) require agencies to identify and provide protections commensurate with the risk and magnitude of harm resulting from unauthorized access, use, disclosure, disruption, modification, or destruction of information collected by or maintained for an agency or of information systems used by or operated for an agency. Makes the head of each agency responsible for providing appropriate information security protections. Requires: (1) each agency to have an annual independent information security effectiveness evaluation; and (2) the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), on the basis of proposed standards developed by the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST), to promulgate information security standards pertaining to federal information systems. Allows an agency to employ more stringent standards. Requires the Director of the National Office for Cyberspace to: (1) ensure the operation of a central federal information security incident center; and (2) oversee the development and implementation of policies, standards, and guidance to cost effectively enhance agency information security. Prohibits an agency from entering into a contract or interagency agreement for information technology without including requirements to provide effective information security. Provides for vulnerability assessments of major systems.
Title
Federal Information Security Amendments Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Watson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-05-20 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-05-05 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2010-05-05 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-05-05 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-05-05 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement. | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB921 (Related) 2009-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4824-4828)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4900/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4900/BILLS-111hr4900ih.pdf |