US HB4881 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to take into trust for the Pascua Yaqui Tribe of Arizona certain land in Pima County, Arizona, and for other purposes.
Title
Old Pascua Community Land Acquisition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 375 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-275. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7291) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 432. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-127. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-115. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2021-11-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 45, 1 Present (Roll no. 346). (text: 11/1/2021 CR H6048-6049) |
2021-11-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6097-6098) |
2021-11-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4881. |
2021-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6048-6050) |
2021-11-01 | House | Ms. Leger Fernandez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-11-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 121. |
2021-11-01 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-166. |
2021-10-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2021-10-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-08-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3204 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.