US HB4878 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-8)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Trails System Act to include national discovery trails and designate the American Discovery Trail, and for other purposes.
Title
National Discovery Trails Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-08-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4693 (Same As) 2022-09-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4878/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4878/BILLS-117hr4878ih.pdf |