US HB4690 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 502.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 502.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize and amend the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Sustaining America’s Fisheries for the Future Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 502. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-685, Part I. |
2022-09-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2022-09-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 18. |
2022-09-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2021-08-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2865 (Related) 2021-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB3128 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 458.
HB3160 (Related) 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB497 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-121.
SB2923 (Related) 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421.
HB5453 (Related) 2021-10-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB3128 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 458.
HB3160 (Related) 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB497 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Became Public Law No: 117-121.
SB2923 (Related) 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421.
HB5453 (Related) 2021-10-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.