US HB5453 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the Fishery Resource Disaster Relief program of the National Marine Fisheries Service, and for other purposes.
Title
Fishery Resource Disasters Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-09-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2923 (Same As) 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421.
HB4690 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 502.
HB4690 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 502.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5453/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5453/BILLS-117hr5453ih.pdf |