US HB4611 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to issue guidance with respect to certain information and communications technology or services contracts, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Software Supply Chain Risk Management Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 412 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 2 (Roll no. 319). (text: CR 9/29/2021 H5535) |
2021-10-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5698-5699) |
2021-09-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4611. |
2021-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5535-5536) |
2021-09-29 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 85. |
2021-09-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-120. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged. |
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-07-21 | House | Introduced in House |