US HB4539 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-4)
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
400 Years of African-American History Commission Act (Sec. 3) This bill establishes the 400 Years of African-American History Commission to develop and carry out activities throughout the United States to commemorate the 400th anniversary of the arrival of Africans in the English colonies at Point Comfort, Virginia, in 1619. The commission must: plan programs to acknowledge the impact that slavery and laws that enforced racial discrimination had on the United States; encourage civic, patriotic, historical, educational, artistic, religious, and economic organizations to organize and participate in anniversary activities; assist states, localities, and nonprofit organizations to further the commemoration; and coordinate for the public scholarly research on the arrival of Africans in the United States and their contributions to this country. (Sec. 5) The commission may provide: (1) grants to communities and nonprofit organizations for the development of programs; (2) grants to research and scholarly organizations to research, publish, or distribute information relating to the arrival of Africans in the United States; and (3) technical assistance to states, localities, and nonprofit organizations to further the commemoration. (Sec. 7) The commission must prepare a strategic plan and submit a final report to Congress that contains a summary of its activities, an accounting of funds it received and expended, and its recommendations. (Sec. 8) The commission shall terminate on July 1, 2020.
Title
400 Years of African-American History Commission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-341. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-07-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-07-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4260-4262) |
2016-07-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4539. |
2016-07-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4260-4263) |
2016-07-05 | House | Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2548 (Same As) 2016-09-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 626.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Virginia
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Virginia