US HB4512 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to establish an outdoor recreation legacy partnership grant program under which Interior may award grants to states, certain political subdivisions of a state, special purpose districts, or certain Indian tribes for projects to (1) acquire land and water for parks and other outdoor recreation purposes, and (2) develop new or renovate existing outdoor recreation facilities. As a condition for receiving a grant, a recipient shall provide matching funds in cash or in kind equal to 100% of the amounts available under the grant. A grant recipient may use the grant to acquire land or water providing outdoor recreation opportunities to the public and develop or renovate outdoor recreational facilities, with priority given to projects that create or significantly enhance access to park and recreational opportunities in an urban neighborhood or community, engage and empower underserved communities and youth, provide opportunities for youth employment or job training, establish or expand public-private partnerships, and take advantage of coordination among various levels of government.
Title
Outdoors for All Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5986 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB1334 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB1458 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1334 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB1458 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Youth employment and child labor
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4512/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4512/BILLS-116hr4512ih.pdf |