US HB4431 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Correcting Miscalculations in Veterans' Pensions Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correcting Miscalculations in Veterans' Pensions Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-09-26HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9076)
2018-09-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4431.
2018-09-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9076-9078)
2018-09-26HouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 737.
2018-09-12HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
2018-09-12HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-946, Part I.
2017-11-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-11-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback