US HB4427 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 203 of the Federal Power Act. This bill amends the Federal Power Act with respect to the prohibition regarding mergers or consolidations by a public utility. Any merger or consolidation of a public utility whose value exceeds $10 million must first be authorized by the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC). In addition, FERC is required to promulgate a rule within 180 days that mandates any public utility seeking to merge or consolidate to notify FERC, within 30 days of transaction consummation, if the value of such merger or consolidation exceeds $1 million but is less than $10 million.
Title
To amend section 203 of the Federal Power Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-03-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1307) |
2016-03-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4427. |
2016-03-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1307-1308) |
2016-03-14 | House | Mr. Whitfield moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-03-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 346. |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-451. |
2016-02-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8 (Related) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government information and archives
Public utilities and utility rates
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Government information and archives
Public utilities and utility rates