US HB4426 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-130.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to ensure that the needs of children are considered in homeland security planning, and for other purposes.
Title
Homeland Security for Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-130. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-05-26 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2516) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 351. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-100. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5539-5540) |
2021-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4426. |
2021-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5539-5541) |
2021-09-29 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Discharged. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-07-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |