US HB438 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act to extend the deadline for a report by the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act to extend the deadline for a report by the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 76. |
2021-07-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-103. |
2021-05-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-26 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2021-05-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB325 (Same As) 2021-09-24 - Became Public Law No: 117-41.
HB4372 (Related) 2021-07-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 58.
HB4502 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Received in the Senate.
HB4372 (Related) 2021-07-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 58.
HB4502 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Received in the Senate.