US SB325 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Became Public Law No: 117-41.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Became Public Law No: 117-41.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act to extend the deadline for a report by the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act to extend the deadline for a report by the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 418 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-41. |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-08-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-08-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 7 (Roll no. 255). |
2021-08-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4350-4351) |
2021-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 325. |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3868-3869; text: CR H3868) |
2021-07-26 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-05-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3489; text: CR S3489) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 40. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-12. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Same As) 2021-07-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 76.