US HB4378 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019 This bill provides FY2020 continuing appropriations to federal agencies through November 21, 2019. It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and prevents a government shutdown that would otherwise occur when FY2020 begins on October 1, 2019, if the 12 regular appropriations bills that fund the federal government for FY2020 have not been enacted. The CR funds most projects and activities at the FY2019 levels with several exceptions that provide funding flexibility and additional appropriations to various programs. Additionally, the CR extends several programs that are scheduled to expire at the end of FY2019, including several health programs, the National Flood Insurance Program, the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program and related programs, several authorities related to immigration, the Calfed Bay-Delta Authorization Act, the Department of Education's National Advisory Committee on Institutional Quality and Integrity, the Export-Import Bank of the United States, and the U.S. Commission on International Religious Freedom. The bill also includes a provision that permits the Department of Agriculture to continue making payments to farmers affected by retaliatory tariffs by accelerating reimbursements to the Commodity Credit Corporation for certain net realized losses sustained in FY2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2020, and Health Extenders Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]

Roll Calls

2019-09-26 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 311 (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-26 - Senate - Amendment SA 942 S.Amdt.942 RC# 310 (Y: 24 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-19 - House - On passage RC# 538 (Y: 301 N: 123 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-59.
2019-09-27SenateSigned by President.
2019-09-27SenatePresented to President.
2019-09-26SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-26SenatePassed Senate, under the order of 9/25/19, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 16. Record Vote Number: 311.
2019-09-26SenateS.Amdt.942 Amendment SA 942 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 24 - 73. Record Vote Number: 310.
2019-09-26SenateS.Amdt.942 Amendment SA 942 proposed by Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S5722-5723; text: CR S5722)
2019-09-26SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5713-5715, S5722-5723)
2019-09-23SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 213.
2019-09-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-09-19HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-19HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 123 (Roll no. 538). (text: CR H7786-7791)
2019-09-19HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-09-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4378.
2019-09-19HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 564. (consideration: CR H7786-7796)
2019-09-19HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 564 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4378 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
2019-09-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR564 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB430 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-4. (TXT | PDF)
HB3039 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3276 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB3421 (Related) 2019-06-21 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1785 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Appropriations
California
Defense spending
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Education
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of Justice
Department of Labor
Department of State
Department of the Interior
Department of Transportation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disaster relief and insurance
Economics and public finance
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Export-Import Bank of the United States
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Floods and storm protection
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Hospital care
Human rights
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Law enforcement officers
Manufacturing
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Military facilities and property
Minority health
New York City
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Religion
Research administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Sexually transmitted diseases
Tariffs
Terrorism
U.S. territories and protectorates
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback