US HB3276 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alters certain requirements and definitions under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program relating to rebate calculations. Specifically, the bill repeals the requirement that drug manufacturers include the prices of certain authorized generic drugs when determining the average manufacturer price (AMP) of brand-name drugs (also known as a "blended AMP"), and excludes manufacturers from the definition of "wholesalers" for purposes of rebate calculations.
Title
Fair AMP Act Fair and Accurate Medicaid Pricing Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3253 (Similar To) 2019-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 116-39. (TXT | PDF)
SB1785 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4378 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
SB1785 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4378 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Health care costs and insurance
Health programs administration and funding
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3276/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3276/BILLS-116hr3276ih.pdf |