US HB4372 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports efforts to increase science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) education at minority-serving institutions of higher education (IHEs), including by requiring the National Science Foundation to award grants for building the capacity of such IHEs to increase the number and success of their students in the STEM workforce.
Title
MSI STEM Achievement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9353-9355) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4372. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9353-9356) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 214. |
2019-11-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-269. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-09-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Congressional oversight
Education
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Higher education
Minority education
Minority employment
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional oversight
Education
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Higher education
Minority education
Minority employment
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula