US HB4311 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-8)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Referral.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Referral.
2017-11-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2098 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 426.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Alliances
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Industrial policy and productivity
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial review and appeals
Manufacturing
Military facilities and property
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Real estate business
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
User charges and fees

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback