US SB2987 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

John S. McCain National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019 This bill authorizes FY2019 appropriations and sets forth policies regarding the military activities of the Department of Defense (DOD), military construction, and the national security programs of the Department of Energy (DOE). It does not provide budget authority, which is provided in subsequent appropriations legislation. The bill authorizes appropriations to DOD for: Procurement; Research, Development, Test, and Evaluation; Operation and Maintenance; Cooperative Threat Reduction; Working Capital Funds; Chemical Agents and Munitions Destruction; Defense-Wide Drug Interdiction and Counter-Drug Activities; the Defense Inspector General; the Armed Forces Retirement Home; and the Defense Health Program. This bill also authorizes appropriations for Overseas Contingency Operations (OCO), which are exempt from limits on discretionary spending. OCO appropriations authorized in the bill support base budget requirements as well as OCO activities. The bill authorizes the FY2019 personnel strengths for active duty and reserve forces and sets forth policies regarding military personnel; compensation and other personnel benefits; health care; acquisition policy and management; DOD organization and management; civilian personnel matters; matters relating to foreign nations; and strategic programs, cyber, and intelligence matters. Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2018 The bill addresses shifting threats to national security and the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States. Military Construction Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019 The bill authorizes appropriations and sets forth policies regarding military construction for the Army, Navy, Air Force, and defense agencies, the North Atlantic Treaty Organization Security Investment Program, and Guard and Reserve Forces facilities. The bill authorizes appropriations for base realignment and closure (BRAC) activities and prohibits an additional BRAC round. The bill also authorizes appropriations and sets forth policies for DOE national security programs, including the National Nuclear Security Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John S. McCain National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
2018-06-05SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Inhofe. With written report No. 115-262.

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB2036 (Related) 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2211 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB4311 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Referral.
HB4747 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5038 (Related) 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1887 (Related) 2018-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Afghanistan
Africa
Alliances
Arctic and polar regions
Arizona
Armed forces and national security
Armed Forces Retirement Home
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Burkina Faso
Caribbean area
Cemeteries and funerals
Chad
Chemical and biological weapons
Child care and development
China
Collective security
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Veterans Affairs
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Florida
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Higher education
Homeland security
Illinois
Immunology and vaccination
India
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Iran
Israel
Kansas
Land transfers
Latin America
Licensing and registrations
Mali
Manufacturing
Marshall Islands
Mauritania
Medical education
Micronesia
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military law
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Neurological disorders
New Mexico
Nicaragua
Niger
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Pacific Ocean
Palau
Poland
Political movements and philosophies
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Reconstruction and stabilization
Religion
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Service animals
Sex offenses
Small business
Somalia
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Spacecraft and satellites
Special education
Strategic materials and reserves
Syria
Taiwan
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Venezuela
Veterans' medical care
Water quality
Water use and supply
Yemen

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback