US HB4747 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 48-7)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defending U.S. Government Communications Act This bill prohibits federal agencies from procuring or obtaining, renewing or extending a contract to obtain or procure, or entering into a contract with an entity that uses any equipment, system, or service with telecommunications equipment or services as a substantial or essential component of any system that is from Huawei Technologies Company, ZTE Corporation, or an entity reasonably believed to be owned or controlled by China.
Title
Defending U.S. Government Communications Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2391 (Same As) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2826 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2625-2627)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6001 (Related) 2018-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3361 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2826 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2625-2627)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6001 (Related) 2018-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3361 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Asia
China
Computers and information technology
Foreign and international corporations
Government operations and politics
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
China
Computers and information technology
Foreign and international corporations
Government operations and politics
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4747/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4747/BILLS-115hr4747ih.pdf |