US HB6001 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Trade with China Enforcement Act
Title
Fair Trade with China Enforcement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2826 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2625-2627)
HB4747 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5116 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2391 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3361 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4747 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5116 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2391 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3361 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Agricultural equipment and machinery
Alliances
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Genetics
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hong Kong
Human rights
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Industrial policy and productivity
Intellectual property
Internet and video services
Jurisdiction and venue
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor vehicles
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Railroads
Securities
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs
Taxation of foreign income
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Wages and earnings
Alliances
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Genetics
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hong Kong
Human rights
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Industrial policy and productivity
Intellectual property
Internet and video services
Jurisdiction and venue
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor vehicles
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Railroads
Securities
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs
Taxation of foreign income
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6001/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6001/BILLS-115hr6001ih.pdf |