US HB4275 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 and revises the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program. Under the existing program, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must develop and fund projects to restore the ecological health of the basin, which is located in Louisiana and Mississippi. The bill requires the EPA to review and revise the basin's comprehensive conservation and management plan at least once every five years. In addition, the bill eliminates a statement of the basin's size.
Title
To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H805) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4275. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H805-806) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 234. |
2019-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-291. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.