US HB422 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to prohibit certain donations to Inaugural Committees, to establish limitations on donations to Inaugural Committees, to require certain reporting by Inaugural Committees, and for other purposes.
Title
Inaugural Fund Integrity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
HR179 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/422/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr422/BILLS-117hr422ih.pdf |